+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (14)
On May 2, 2013 in the House:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
- Pending third reading on day 28 Favorable from Constitution, Campaigns and Elections
On April 30, 2013 in the House:
- Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Constitution, Campaigns and Elections
On February 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed
- Constitution, Campaign Finance, Ethics, and Elections Amendment Offered
- Pittman motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 96
- Constitution, Campaign Finance, Ethics, and Elections Amendment Offered
- Pittman motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 97
- Constitution, Campaign Finance, Ethics, and Elections third Amendment Offered
- Pittman motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 98
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 99
- Engrossed
On February 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 3 amendments
On February 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Constitution, Campaign Finance, Ethics, and Elections
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (4)
February 19, 2013: Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 99
- Yeas: 30
February 19, 2013: Pittman motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 96
- Yeas: 29
February 19, 2013: Pittman motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 97
- Yeas: 29
February 19, 2013: Pittman motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 98
- Yeas: 29
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor