+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (13)
On June 6, 2021 in the Senate:
- Enacted (Act 2021-202)
On April 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- Assigned Act No. 2021-202.
On April 15, 2021 in the House:
- Signature Requested
On April 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- Passed Second House
- Enrolled
On April 15, 2021 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 861
On February 24, 2021 in the House:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On February 11, 2021 in the House:
- Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Judiciary
On February 11, 2021 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 171
On February 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On February 2, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Judiciary
+ − Votes (2)
April 15, 2021: Roll 861
- Yeas: 90
- Present/NV: 13
February 11, 2021: Roll 171
- Yeas: 28
- Present/NV: 6
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor