+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (18)
On April 18, 2017 in the Senate:
- Assigned Act No. 2017-151 on 04/18/2017.
On April 18, 2017 in the House:
- Signature Requested
On April 18, 2017 in the Senate:
- Passed Second House
On April 18, 2017 in the House:
- Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 511
- Resolution of Local Application Submitted
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 510
- Third Reading Passed
On April 13, 2017 in the House:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On February 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 143
On February 28, 2017 in the House:
- Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Shelby County Legislation
On February 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Holley motion to Carry Over to the Call of the Chair adopted Voice Vote
- Holley motion to Reconsider adopted Voice Vote
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass lost Roll Call 134
- Third Reading Carried Over to Call of the Chair
On February 16, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On February 14, 2017 in the Senate:
- Rereferred to Local Legislation Shelby County
On February 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation
+ − Votes (4)
April 18, 2017: Roll 510
- Yeas: 65
- Present/NV: 39
April 18, 2017: Roll 511
- Yeas: 27
- Present/NV: 77
February 28, 2017: Roll 143
- Yeas: 21
- Present/NV: 14
February 23, 2017: Roll 134
- Yeas: 10
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 24
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor