+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (21)
On May 20, 2024 in the Senate:
- Enacted
On May 9, 2024 in the Senate:
- Delivered to Governor
On May 9, 2024 in the House:
- Signature Requested
On May 9, 2024 in the Senate:
- Ready to Enroll
On May 9, 2024 in the House:
- Third Reading in Second House
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass - Adopted Roll Call 1195
On May 9, 2024 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
On April 30, 2024 in the House:
- Reported Out of Committee Second House
- Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar
On April 23, 2024 in the Senate:
- Third Reading in House of Origin
- Finance and Taxation General Fund 1st Substitute Offered
- Orr motion to Adopt - Adopted Roll Call 665
On April 23, 2024 in the House:
- Read for the first time and referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means General Fund
On April 23, 2024 in the Senate:
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass as Amended - Adopted Roll Call 666
- Engrossed
On April 23, 2024 in the House:
- Pending Committee Action in Second House
On April 18, 2024 in the Senate:
- Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar
On April 17, 2024 in the Senate:
- Finance and Taxation General Fund 1st Substitute
- Reported Out of Committee House of Origin
On February 6, 2024 in the Senate:
- Read for the first time and referred to the Senate Committee on Finance and Taxation General Fund
- Pending Committee Action in House of Origin
+ − Fiscal Notes (3)
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (5)
May 9, 2024: Third Reading in Second House Vote
- Yeas: 102
- Present/NV: 1
May 9, 2024: Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass - Adopted Roll Call 1195 Vote
- Yeas: 102
- Present/NV: 1
April 23, 2024: Third Reading in House of Origin Vote
- Yeas: 32
- Present/NV: 3
April 23, 2024: Orr motion to Adopt - Adopted Roll Call 665 Vote
- Yeas: 32
- Present/NV: 3
April 23, 2024: Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass as Amended - Adopted Roll Call 666 Vote
- Yeas: 32
- Present/NV: 3
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor