+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (11)
On April 18, 2019 in the House:
- Read Second Time in Second House
- Pending third reading on day 12 Favorable from Public Safety and Homeland Security
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On April 11, 2019 in the House:
- Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Public Safety and Homeland Security
On April 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Engrossed
On April 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 192
- Ward motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 191
- Education Policy Amendment Offered
- Third Reading Passed
On March 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment
On March 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Education Policy
+ − Votes (2)
April 9, 2019: Roll 191
- Yeas: 34
- Present/NV: 1
April 9, 2019: Roll 192
- Yeas: 34
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor