+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (11)
On April 6, 2022 in the House:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
- Pending third reading on day 29 Favorable from Judiciary
On March 30, 2022 in the House:
- Rereferred from CC&E to Judy
On March 29, 2022 in the Senate:
- Engrossed
On March 29, 2022 in the House:
- Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Constitution, Campaigns and Elections
On March 29, 2022 in the Senate:
- Judiciary first Substitute Offered
- Third Reading Passed
- Coleman-Madison motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 732
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 733
On March 9, 2022 in the Senate:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar with 1 substitute and
On January 11, 2022 in the Senate:
- Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Judiciary
+ − Impact Statement
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor