+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (24)
On July 14, 2021 in the Senate:
- Enacted (Act 2021-495)
On May 17, 2021 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
On May 17, 2021 in the House:
- Concurred in Second House Amendment
On May 17, 2021 in the Senate:
- Reed motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 1419
- Concurrence Requested
On May 17, 2021 in the House:
- Signature Requested
On April 29, 2021 in the House:
- Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 1083
- County and Municipal Government Amendment Offered
- Third Reading Passed
- England Amendment Offered
- Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 1084
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1085
On April 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- Assigned Act No. 2021-495.
On April 22, 2021 in the House:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment
On April 8, 2021 in the House:
- Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on County and Municipal Government
On April 8, 2021 in the Senate:
- Engrossed
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 901
- Melson motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 900
- Melson Amendment Offered
- Melson motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 899
- Judiciary Amendment Offered
- Third Reading Passed
On February 24, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment
On February 2, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Judiciary
+ − Amendments (4)
+ − Votes (7)
May 17, 2021: Roll 1419
- Yeas: 30
- Present/NV: 4
April 29, 2021: Roll 1084
- Yeas: 96
- Present/NV: 7
April 29, 2021: Roll 1085
- Yeas: 86
- Nays: 14
- Present/NV: 3
April 29, 2021: Roll 1083
- Yeas: 92
- Present/NV: 11
April 8, 2021: Roll 899
- Yeas: 32
- Present/NV: 2
April 8, 2021: Roll 900
- Yeas: 32
- Present/NV: 2
April 8, 2021: Roll 901
- Yeas: 32
- Present/NV: 2
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor