+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (15)
On August 31, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read Second Time in Second House
On April 22, 2021 in the House:
- Pending third reading on day 26 Favorable from Judiciary
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On March 11, 2021 in the House:
- Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Judiciary
On March 11, 2021 in the Senate:
- Engrossed
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 532
- Melson motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 531
- Melson Amendment Offered
- Melson motion to Table adopted Voice Vote
- Melson motion to Table adopted Voice Vote
- Agriculture, Conservation and Forestry Amendment Offered
- Agriculture, Conservation and Forestry Amendment Offered
- Third Reading Passed
On February 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 2 amendments
On February 2, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Forestry
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (2)
March 11, 2021: Roll 531
- Yeas: 29
- Present/NV: 5
March 11, 2021: Roll 532
- Yeas: 29
- Present/NV: 5
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor