+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (14)
On March 13, 2014 in the House:
- Assigned Act No. 2014-179.
- Signature Requested
On March 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
- Passed Second House
On March 13, 2014 in the House:
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 761
- Third Reading Passed
On February 12, 2014 in the House:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On January 30, 2014 in the House:
- Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Military and Veterans Affairs
On January 30, 2014 in the Senate:
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 242
- Third Reading Passed
On January 28, 2014 in the Senate:
- Dial motion to Carry Over to the Call of the Chair adopted Voice Vote
- Third Reading Carried Over to Call of the Chair
On January 22, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On January 14, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Veterans and Military Affairs
+ − Vote
March 13, 2014: Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 761
- Yeas: 100
- Absent: 1
+ − Sponsors (3)
Type:
Primary Sponsor