+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (19)
On May 7, 2019 in the House:
- Read Second Time in Second House
On April 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Assigned Act No. 2019-98.
- Banking and Insurance first Amendment Offered
On April 25, 2019 in the House:
- Signature Requested
On April 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
On April 23, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed Second House
On April 23, 2019 in the House:
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 337
- Third Reading Passed
On April 18, 2019 in the House:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On April 3, 2019 in the House:
- Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Technology and Research
On April 3, 2019 in the Senate:
- Engrossed
On April 2, 2019 in the Senate:
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 87
- Waggoner motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 86
- Waggoner Amendment Offered
- Waggoner motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 85
- Banking and Insurance Amendment Offered
- Third Reading Passed
On March 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment
On March 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Banking and Insurance
+ − Votes (4)
April 23, 2019: Roll 337
- Yeas: 99
- Present/NV: 5
April 2, 2019: Roll 85
- Yeas: 32
- Present/NV: 3
April 2, 2019: Roll 86
- Yeas: 32
- Present/NV: 3
April 2, 2019: Roll 87
- Yeas: 32
- Present/NV: 3
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor