+ − Effective Date
- June 01, 2022
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (12)
On March 1, 2022 in the Senate:
- Assigned Act No. 2022-104.
- Enrolled
On March 1, 2022 in the House:
- Signature Requested
On March 1, 2022 in the Senate:
- Passed Second House
On February 24, 2022 in the House:
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 337
- Third Reading Passed
On February 16, 2022 in the House:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On February 2, 2022 in the House:
- Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on State Government
On February 1, 2022 in the Senate:
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 41
- Third Reading Passed
On January 18, 2022 in the Senate:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On January 11, 2022 in the Senate:
- Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Governmental Affairs
+ − Impact Statements (3)
+ − Vote
February 1, 2022: Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 41 Vote
- Yeas: 32
- Present/NV: 3
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor