+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (13)
On June 12, 2020 in the Senate:
- Enacted (Act 2019-97)
On April 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Assigned Act No. 2019-97.
On April 25, 2019 in the House:
- Signature Requested
On April 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
On April 23, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed Second House
On April 23, 2019 in the House:
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 335
- Third Reading Passed
On April 11, 2019 in the House:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On April 2, 2019 in the House:
- Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Insurance
On April 2, 2019 in the Senate:
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 89
- Third Reading Passed
On March 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On March 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Banking and Insurance
+ − Votes (2)
April 23, 2019: Roll 335
- Yeas: 96
- Present/NV: 8
April 2, 2019: Roll 89
- Yeas: 32
- Present/NV: 3
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor