+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (17)
On April 30, 2015 in the Senate:
- Assigned Act No. 2015-120.
On April 30, 2015 in the House:
- Signature Requested
On April 30, 2015 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
On April 28, 2015 in the Senate:
- Passed Second House
On April 28, 2015 in the House:
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 540
- Third Reading Passed
On April 9, 2015 in the House:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On March 31, 2015 in the Senate:
- Engrossed
On March 31, 2015 in the House:
- Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Transportation, Utilities and Infrastructure
On March 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 210
- Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 209
- Pittman Amendment Offered
- Third Reading Passed
On March 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Ward motion to Carry Over to the Call of the Chair adopted Voice Vote
- Third Reading Carried Over to Call of the Chair
On March 5, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On March 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Transportation & Energy
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (3)
April 28, 2015: Roll 540
- Yeas: 99
- Present/NV: 6
March 19, 2015: Roll 209
- Yeas: 28
- Nays: 4
- Present/NV: 3
March 19, 2015: Roll 210
- Yeas: 31
- Present/NV: 4
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor