+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (12)
On August 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Assigned Act No. 2015-530.
On August 11, 2015 in the House:
- Signature Requested
On August 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
On August 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- Passed Second House
On August 10, 2015 in the House:
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 42
- Third Reading Passed
On August 7, 2015 in the House:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On August 6, 2015 in the House:
- Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Jefferson County Legislation
On August 6, 2015 in the Senate:
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 38
- Third Reading Passed
On August 5, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On August 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation, Jefferson County
+ − Votes (2)
August 10, 2015: Roll 42
- Yeas: 18
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 84
August 6, 2015: Roll 38
- Yeas: 28
- Present/NV: 7
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor