+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (12)
On August 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Assigned Act No. 2015-528.
On August 11, 2015 in the House:
- Signature Requested
On August 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
- Passed Second House
On August 11, 2015 in the House:
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 57
- Third Reading Passed
On August 7, 2015 in the House:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On August 6, 2015 in the House:
- Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Internal Affairs
On August 6, 2015 in the Senate:
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 42
- Third Reading Passed
On August 5, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On August 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Finance and Taxation General Fund
+ − Votes (2)
August 11, 2015: Roll 57
- Yeas: 89
- Present/NV: 15
August 6, 2015: Roll 42
- Yeas: 29
- Present/NV: 6
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor