+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (11)
On February 26, 2014 in the House:
- Pending third reading on day 19 Favorable from Ways and Means Education with 1 amendment
- Ways and Means Education first Amendment Offered
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment
On January 21, 2014 in the House:
- Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Ways and Means Education
On January 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- Engrossed
On January 16, 2014 in the Senate:
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 26
- Taylor motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 25
- Finance and Taxation General Fund Amendment Offered
- Third Reading Passed
On January 15, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment
On January 14, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Finance and Taxation General Fund
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (3)
January 16, 2014: Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 26
- Yeas: 34
January 16, 2014: Taylor motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 25
- Yeas: 33
January 15, 2014: Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment
- Yeas: 12
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor