+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (15)
On August 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Assigned Act No. 2015-527.
On August 11, 2015 in the House:
- Signature Requested
On August 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
- Passed Second House
On August 11, 2015 in the House:
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 56
- Third Reading Passed
On August 7, 2015 in the House:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On August 6, 2015 in the Senate:
- Engrossed
On August 6, 2015 in the House:
On August 6, 2015 in the Senate:
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 41
- Sanford motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 40
- Sanford Amendment Offered
- Third Reading Passed
On August 5, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On August 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Finance and Taxation General Fund
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (3)
August 11, 2015: Roll 56
- Yeas: 90
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 13
August 6, 2015: Roll 40
- Yeas: 28
- Present/NV: 7
August 6, 2015: Roll 41
- Yeas: 28
- Present/NV: 7
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor