+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (12)
On June 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- Assigned Act No. 2015-387.
- Enrolled
On June 2, 2015 in the House:
- Signature Requested
On June 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- Passed Second House
On June 2, 2015 in the House:
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1193
- Third Reading Passed
On May 28, 2015 in the House:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On May 26, 2015 in the House:
- Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Local Legislation
On May 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1164
- Third Reading Passed
On May 21, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On May 7, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation
+ − Votes (2)
June 2, 2015: Roll 1193
- Yeas: 36
- Present/NV: 69
May 26, 2015: Roll 1164
- Yeas: 17
- Nays: 3
- Present/NV: 15
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor