+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (10)
On May 4, 2016 in the House:
- McCampbell motion to Carry Over Temporarily adopted Voice Vote
- Third Reading Carried Over
On April 27, 2016 in the House:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On April 26, 2016 in the House:
- Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Financial Services
On April 26, 2016 in the Senate:
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 824
- Third Reading Passed
- Holley motion to Carry Over to the Call of the Chair adopted Voice Vote
- Third Reading Carried Over to Call of the Chair
On April 21, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On April 20, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Banking and Insurance
+ − Vote
April 26, 2016: Roll 824
- Yeas: 23
- Present/NV: 12
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor