+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (11)
On May 19, 2017 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
On May 19, 2017 in the House:
- Signature Requested
On May 19, 2017 in the Senate:
- Passed Second House
On May 19, 2017 in the House:
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 997
- Third Reading Passed
On May 17, 2017 in the House:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On May 16, 2017 in the House:
- Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Local Legislation
On May 16, 2017 in the Senate:
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1056
- Third Reading Passed
On May 11, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On May 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation
+ − Votes (2)
May 19, 2017: Roll 997
- Yeas: 19
- Present/NV: 86
May 16, 2017: Roll 1056
- Yeas: 21
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 13
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor