+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (17)
On August 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Assigned Act No. 2015-526.
On August 11, 2015 in the House:
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 55
- Third Reading Passed
- Signature Requested
- Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 54
- Ways and Means General Fund Amendment Offered
On August 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Concurrence Requested
- Orr motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 71
On August 11, 2015 in the House:
- Concurred in Second House Amendment
On August 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
On August 6, 2015 in the House:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment
- Rereferred from Ethics and Campaign Fund to Ways and means General Fund
On August 5, 2015 in the House:
- Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Ethics and Campaign Finance
On August 5, 2015 in the Senate:
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 25
- Third Reading Passed
On August 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On August 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Finance and Taxation General Fund
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (4)
August 11, 2015: Roll 54
- Yeas: 83
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 20
August 11, 2015: Roll 55
- Yeas: 80
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 22
August 11, 2015: Roll 71
- Yeas: 24
- Present/NV: 11
August 5, 2015: Roll 25
- Yeas: 30
- Present/NV: 5
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor