+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (13)
On May 9, 2013 in the House:
- Forwarded to Governor at 11:55 a.m. on May 9, 2013
- Assigned Act No. 2013-237.
- Signature Requested
On May 9, 2013 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
- Passed Second House
On May 9, 2013 in the House:
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1159
- Third Reading Passed
On May 7, 2013 in the House:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On May 2, 2013 in the House:
- Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Lee County Legislation
On May 2, 2013 in the Senate:
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 736
- Third Reading Passed
On April 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On April 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation No. 1
+ − Vote
May 9, 2013: Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1159
- Yeas: 22
- Absent: 64
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor