+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (20)
On August 11, 2015 in the House:
- Assigned Act No. 2015-525.
On August 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
- Passed Second House
On August 11, 2015 in the House:
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 53
- Clouse motion to reconsider adopted Voice Vote
- Clouse notive in writing filed
- Signature Requested
On August 10, 2015 in the House:
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass lost Roll Call 46
- Lost in second house
- PERMISSION GRANTED
On August 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- Delivered to Governor at 2:09 p.m. on August 11, 2015
On August 6, 2015 in the House:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On August 5, 2015 in the Senate:
- Engrossed
On August 5, 2015 in the House:
- Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Ways and Means General Fund
On August 5, 2015 in the Senate:
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 31
- Orr motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 30
- Orr Amendment Offered
- Third Reading Passed
On August 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On August 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Finance and Taxation General Fund
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (4)
August 11, 2015: Roll 53
- Yeas: 59
- Nays: 21
- Present/NV: 24
August 10, 2015: Roll 46
- Yeas: 44
- Nays: 49
- Present/NV: 11
August 5, 2015: Roll 30
- Yeas: 32
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 2
August 5, 2015: Roll 31
- Yeas: 32
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 2
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor