+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (14)
On June 14, 2020 in the Senate:
- Enacted (Act 2019-210)
On May 9, 2020 in the House:
- Delivered to Governor at 3:33 p.m. on May 9, 2020.
On May 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Assigned Act No. 2019-210.
On May 14, 2019 in the House:
- Signature Requested
On May 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
- Passed Second House
On May 14, 2019 in the House:
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 620
- Third Reading Passed
On April 9, 2019 in the House:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On April 3, 2019 in the House:
- Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Local Legislation
On April 3, 2019 in the Senate:
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 109
- Third Reading Passed
On April 2, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On March 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation
+ − Votes (2)
May 14, 2019: Roll 620
- Yeas: 12
- Present/NV: 92
April 3, 2019: Roll 109
- Yeas: 31
- Present/NV: 4
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor