+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (16)
On May 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Delivered to Secretary of State at 11:59 p.m. on May 20, 2013
- Assigned Act No. 2013-269.
- Enrolled
On May 20, 2013 in the House:
- Bracy intended to vote "Nay"
- Signature Requested
On May 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Passed Second House
On May 20, 2013 in the House:
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1275
- Motion to Previous Question adopted Roll Call 1274
- Third Reading Passed
On April 4, 2013 in the House:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On March 20, 2013 in the House:
- Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Constitution, Campaigns and Elections
On March 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 247
- Rules Committee Petition to Cease Debate adopted Roll Call 246
- Third Reading Passed
On February 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On February 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Judiciary
+ − Votes (4)
May 20, 2013: Motion to Previous Question adopted Roll Call 1274
- Yeas: 64
- Nays: 29
May 20, 2013: Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1275
- Yeas: 75
- Nays: 6
- Absent: 2
March 20, 2013: Rules Committee Petition to Cease Debate adopted Roll Call 246
- Yeas: 24
- Nays: 2
- Absent: 2
February 14, 2013: Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
- Yeas: 9
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor