+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (19)
On September 16, 2019 in the Senate:
- Enacted (Act 2019-345)
On May 31, 2019 in the House:
- Signature Requested
On May 31, 2019 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
- Passed Second House
On May 31, 2019 in the House:
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1255
- Third Reading Passed
On May 31, 2019 in the Senate:
- Assigned Act No. 2019-345.
On May 22, 2019 in the House:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On May 21, 2019 in the House:
- Rereferred from W&ME to EP
On May 16, 2019 in the Senate:
- Singleton Amendment Offered
- Third Reading Passed
On May 16, 2019 in the House:
- Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Ways and Means Education
On May 16, 2019 in the Senate:
- Marsh motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 895
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 896
- Engrossed
On May 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Marsh motion to Carry Over to the Call of the Chair adopted Voice Vote
- Third Reading Carried Over to Call of the Chair
On May 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On May 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Education Policy
+ − Votes (3)
May 31, 2019: Roll 1255
- Yeas: 78
- Nays: 21
- Present/NV: 5
May 16, 2019: Roll 895
- Yeas: 29
- Present/NV: 6
May 16, 2019: Roll 896
- Yeas: 30
- Present/NV: 5
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor