+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (9)
On May 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- Indefinitely Postponed in House of Origin
On May 4, 2021 in the Senate:
- Indefinitely Postponed
On April 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Finance and Taxation General Fund first Amendment Offered
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment
On April 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Finance and Taxation General Fund
On February 23, 2021 in the House:
- Engrossed
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 112
- Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 111
- Ways and Means General Fund Amendment Offered
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor