+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (13)
On September 16, 2019 in the Senate:
- Enacted (Act 2019-472)
On May 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- Assigned Act No. 2019-472.
- Enrolled
On May 30, 2019 in the House:
- Signature Requested
On May 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed Second House
On May 30, 2019 in the House:
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1161
- Third Reading Passed
On May 29, 2019 in the House:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On May 23, 2019 in the House:
- Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Baldwin County Legislation
On May 23, 2019 in the Senate:
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1028
- Third Reading Passed
On May 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On May 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation
+ − Votes (2)
May 30, 2019: Roll 1161
- Yeas: 20
- Present/NV: 84
May 23, 2019: Roll 1028
- Yeas: 28
- Present/NV: 7
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor