+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (8)
On May 21, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read Second Time in Second House
On April 29, 2021 in the House:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
- Pending third reading on day 28 Favorable from Economic Development and Tourism
On April 20, 2021 in the House:
- Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Economic Development and Tourism
On April 20, 2021 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1101
On April 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On April 13, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Fiscal Responsibility and Economic Development
+ − Vote
April 20, 2021: Roll 1101
- Yeas: 29
- Present/NV: 5
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor