+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (13)
On May 18, 2021 in the Senate:
- Enacted (Act 2021-463)
On May 6, 2021 in the Senate:
- Assigned Act No. 2021-463.
On May 6, 2021 in the House:
- Signature Requested
On May 6, 2021 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
- Passed Second House
On May 6, 2021 in the House:
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1154
- Third Reading Passed
On April 29, 2021 in the House:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On April 20, 2021 in the House:
- Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Economic Development and Tourism
On April 20, 2021 in the Senate:
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1087
- Third Reading Passed
On April 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On April 7, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Fiscal Responsibility and Economic Development
+ − Votes (2)
May 6, 2021: Roll 1154
- Yeas: 71
- Nays: 3
- Present/NV: 29
April 20, 2021: Roll 1087
- Yeas: 27
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 6
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor