+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (12)
On August 13, 2021 in the Senate:
- Enacted (Act 2021-398)
On May 4, 2021 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
- Assigned Act No. 2021-398.
On May 4, 2021 in the House:
- Signature Requested
On May 4, 2021 in the Senate:
- Passed Second House
On April 29, 2021 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1102
On April 22, 2021 in the House:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On April 13, 2021 in the House:
- Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Fiscal Responsibility
On April 13, 2021 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 918
On April 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Fiscal Responsibility and Economic Development
+ − Votes (2)
April 29, 2021: Roll 1102
- Yeas: 96
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 6
April 13, 2021: Roll 918
- Yeas: 19
- Present/NV: 15
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor