+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (13)
On June 20, 2020 in the Senate:
- Enacted (Act 2019-301)
On May 23, 2019 in the Senate:
- Assigned Act No. 2019-301.
On May 23, 2019 in the House:
- Signature Requested
On May 23, 2019 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
- Passed Second House
On May 23, 2019 in the House:
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 908
- Third Reading Passed
On April 11, 2019 in the House:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On March 21, 2019 in the House:
- Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Health
On March 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 42
- Third Reading Adopted
On March 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On March 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Healthcare
+ − Votes (2)
May 23, 2019: Roll 908
- Yeas: 76
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 27
March 21, 2019: Roll 42
- Yeas: 28
- Present/NV: 7
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor