+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (11)
On April 21, 2016 in the House:
- Signature Requested
On April 21, 2016 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
- Passed Second House
On April 21, 2016 in the House:
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 708
- Third Reading Passed
On April 20, 2016 in the House:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On April 19, 2016 in the House:
- Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Local Legislation
On April 19, 2016 in the Senate:
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 614
- Third Reading Passed
On April 7, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On March 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation
+ − Votes (5)
April 21, 2016: Roll 708
- Yeas: 20
- Present/NV: 85
April 19, 2016: Roll 614
- Yeas: 24
- Present/NV: 11
May 20, 2013: Roll 1080
April 25, 2013: Roll 899
- Yeas: 99
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 5
April 25, 2013: Roll 900
- Yeas: 84
- Present/NV: 21
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor