+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (17)
On September 16, 2019 in the Senate:
- Enacted (Act 2019-377)
On May 29, 2019 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
- Delivered to Governor at 1:34 p.m. on May 29, 2019
On May 29, 2019 in the House:
- Signature Requested
On May 28, 2019 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed
- Baldwin County Legislation Amendment Offered
- Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 1058
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1059
On May 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- Concurrence Requested
- Marsh motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 1177
On May 28, 2019 in the House:
- Concurred in Second House Amendment
On May 23, 2019 in the House:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment
On May 8, 2019 in the House:
- Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Baldwin County Legislation
On May 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 654
- Third Reading Passed
On May 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On May 2, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation
+ − Votes (4)
May 28, 2019: Roll 1058
- Yeas: 14
- Present/NV: 90
May 28, 2019: Roll 1059
- Yeas: 13
- Present/NV: 91
May 28, 2019: Roll 1177
- Yeas: 32
- Present/NV: 3
May 8, 2019: Roll 654
- Yeas: 27
- Present/NV: 8
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor