+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (9)
On June 24, 2019 in the House:
- Read Second Time in Second House
On May 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- Further Consideration
On May 28, 2019 in the House:
- Pending third reading on day 26 Favorable from Education Policy
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On May 21, 2019 in the House:
- Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Education Policy
On May 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 914
- Third Reading Passed
On May 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On April 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Education Policy
+ − Vote
May 21, 2019: Roll 914
- Yeas: 26
- Present/NV: 9
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor