+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (13)
On August 6, 2021 in the Senate:
- Enacted (Act 2021-281)
On April 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- Assigned Act No. 2021-281.
On April 15, 2021 in the House:
- Signature Requested
On April 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
- Passed Second House
On April 15, 2021 in the House:
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 828
- Third Reading Passed
On April 13, 2021 in the House:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On April 8, 2021 in the House:
- Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Local Legislation
On April 8, 2021 in the Senate:
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 855
- Third Reading Passed
On April 7, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On March 18, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation
+ − Votes (2)
April 15, 2021: Roll 828
- Yeas: 31
- Present/NV: 72
April 8, 2021: Roll 855
- Yeas: 30
- Present/NV: 4
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor