+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (7)
On May 3, 2017 in the House:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On May 2, 2017 in the House:
- Rereferred from Education Policy to Sate Governement
On April 27, 2017 in the House:
- Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Education Policy
On April 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 765
On April 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On April 4, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Education and Youth Affairs
+ − Vote
April 27, 2017: Roll 765
- Yeas: 26
- Present/NV: 9
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor