+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (6)
On February 23, 2017 in the House:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On February 14, 2017 in the House:
- Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Commerce and Small Business
On February 14, 2017 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 35
On February 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On February 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Governmental Affairs
+ − Votes (7)
May 19, 2017: Roll 1008
- Yeas: 85
- Present/NV: 20
May 19, 2017: Roll 1007
- Yeas: 59
- Present/NV: 46
May 11, 2017: Roll 1030
- Yeas: 27
- Present/NV: 8
May 11, 2017: Roll 1029
- Yeas: 27
- Present/NV: 8
April 18, 2017: Roll 516
- Yeas: 63
- Present/NV: 41
April 18, 2017: Roll 517
- Yeas: 27
- Present/NV: 77
February 14, 2017: Roll 35
- Yeas: 31
- Present/NV: 4
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor