+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (21)
On May 17, 2024 in the Senate:
- Enacted
On May 7, 2024 in the House:
- Signature Requested
On May 7, 2024 in the Senate:
- Ready to Enroll
- Enrolled
On May 7, 2024 in the House:
- Third Reading in Second House
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass - Adopted Roll Call 1121
On May 7, 2024 in the Senate:
- Delivered to Governor
On May 2, 2024 in the House:
- Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar
On May 1, 2024 in the House:
- Reported Out of Committee Second House
On April 30, 2024 in the Senate:
- Third Reading in House of Origin
- Fiscal Responsibility and Economic Development 1st Substitute Offered
- Waggoner motion to Adopt - Adopted Roll Call 865
On April 30, 2024 in the House:
- Read for the first time and referred to the House Committee on Economic Development and Tourism
On April 30, 2024 in the Senate:
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass as Amended - Adopted Roll Call 866
- Engrossed
On April 30, 2024 in the House:
- Pending Committee Action in Second House
On April 25, 2024 in the Senate:
- Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar
On April 24, 2024 in the Senate:
- Fiscal Responsibility and Economic Development 1st Substitute
- Reported Out of Committee House of Origin
On April 16, 2024 in the Senate:
- Read for the first time and referred to the Senate Committee on Fiscal Responsibility and Economic Development
- Pending Committee Action in House of Origin
+ − Fiscal Notes (3)
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (5)
May 7, 2024: Third Reading in Second House Vote
- Yeas: 85
- Nays: 3
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 14
May 7, 2024: Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass - Adopted Roll Call 1121 Vote
- Yeas: 71
- Nays: 4
- Present/NV: 3
- Absent: 25
April 30, 2024: Third Reading in House of Origin Vote
- Yeas: 34
- Present/NV: 1
April 30, 2024: Waggoner motion to Adopt - Adopted Roll Call 865 Vote
- Yeas: 34
- Present/NV: 1
April 30, 2024: Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass as Amended - Adopted Roll Call 866 Vote
- Yeas: 34
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsor
J.T. 'Jabo' Waggoner
Type:
Primary Sponsor