+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (13)
On September 16, 2019 in the Senate:
- Enacted (Act 2019-227)
On May 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Assigned Act No. 2019-227.
On May 15, 2019 in the House:
- Signature Requested
On May 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
- Passed Second House
On May 14, 2019 in the House:
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 700
- Third Reading Passed
On May 7, 2019 in the House:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On May 2, 2019 in the House:
- Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Agriculture and Forestry
On May 2, 2019 in the Senate:
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 582
- Third Reading Passed
On April 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On April 23, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Forestry
+ − Votes (2)
May 14, 2019: Roll 700
- Yeas: 102
- Present/NV: 2
May 2, 2019: Roll 582
- Yeas: 29
- Present/NV: 6
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor