+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (25)
On June 13, 2021 in the Senate:
- Enacted (Act 2021-477)
On May 17, 2021 in the Senate:
- Assigned Act No. 2021-477.
- Forwarded to Governor
On May 17, 2021 in the House:
- Signature Requested
On May 17, 2021 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
- Concurred in Conference Report
On May 17, 2021 in the House:
- Hill motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 1206
- Conference Report Concurrence Requested
On May 17, 2021 in the Senate:
- Chambliss motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 1417
- Conference Report
On May 6, 2021 in the House:
- Conference Committee Requested
- Hill motion to Accede adopted Roll Call 1123 House appoints Hill, Wadsworth and Chestnut
On May 6, 2021 in the Senate:
- Conference Committee Appointed
On May 4, 2021 in the Senate:
- Concurrence Requested
- Chambliss motion to Non Concur and Appoint Conference Committee adopted Roll Call 1304 P&PO appoints Chambliss, Barfoot and Singleton
On April 29, 2021 in the House:
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1092
- Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 1091
- Rowe Amendment Offered
- Third Reading Passed
On April 22, 2021 in the House:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On April 15, 2021 in the House:
- Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Judiciary
On April 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 988
- Third Reading Passed
On March 18, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On March 11, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Judiciary
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (7)
May 17, 2021: Roll 1206
- Yeas: 67
- Nays: 29
- Present/NV: 7
May 17, 2021: Roll 1417
- Yeas: 28
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 5
May 6, 2021: Roll 1123
- Yeas: 90
- Present/NV: 13
May 4, 2021: Roll 1304
- Yeas: 30
- Present/NV: 4
April 29, 2021: Roll 1091
- Yeas: 96
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 5
April 29, 2021: Roll 1092
- Yeas: 84
- Nays: 17
- Present/NV: 2
April 15, 2021: Roll 988
- Yeas: 29
- Present/NV: 5
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor