+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (10)
On April 30, 2015 in the House:
- Pending third reading on day 19 Favorable from Commerce and Small Business
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On April 21, 2015 in the House:
- Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Commerce and Small Business
On April 21, 2015 in the Senate:
- Engrossed
On April 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 538
- Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 537
- Governmental Affairs Amendment Offered
- Third Reading Passed
On April 7, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment
On April 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Governmental Affairs
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (2)
April 16, 2015: Roll 537
- Yeas: 30
- Present/NV: 5
April 16, 2015: Roll 538
- Yeas: 30
- Present/NV: 5
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor