+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (20)
On September 16, 2019 in the Senate:
- Enacted (Act 2019-465)
On May 29, 2019 in the House:
- Signature Requested
On May 29, 2019 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
- Assigned Act No. 2019-465.
On May 28, 2019 in the House:
- Concurred in Second House Amendment
On May 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- Concurrence Requested
- Figures motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 1182
On May 23, 2019 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed
- Judiciary Amendment Offered
- Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 1021
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1022
On May 22, 2019 in the House:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment
On May 21, 2019 in the House:
- Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Judiciary
On May 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- Engrossed
On May 16, 2019 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed
- Figures Amendment Offered
- Figures motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 879
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 880
On May 2, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On April 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Judiciary
+ − Votes (5)
May 28, 2019: Roll 1182
- Yeas: 32
- Present/NV: 3
May 23, 2019: Roll 1021
- Yeas: 102
- Present/NV: 2
May 23, 2019: Roll 1022
- Yeas: 101
- Present/NV: 3
May 16, 2019: Roll 879
- Yeas: 18
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 15
May 16, 2019: Roll 880
- Yeas: 32
- Present/NV: 3
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor