+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (24)
On October 4, 2021 in the Senate:
- Passed by House of Origin
On April 8, 2021 in the Senate:
- Engrossed
On April 7, 2021 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed
- Tourism first Substitute Offered
- McClendon motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 817
- Elliott Amendment Offered
- Elliott motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 818
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 819
- Chambliss motion to Reconsider adopted Roll Call 820
- Orr Amendment Offered
- Orr motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 821
- Chambliss Amendment Offered
- McClendon motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 822
- Chambliss Amendment Offered
- McClendon motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 823
- Chambliss Amendment Offered
- McClendon motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 824
- Chambliss Amendment Offered
- McClendon motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 825
- Chambliss Amendment Offered
- McClendon motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 826
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 827
On March 18, 2021 in the Senate:
- Reported from Tourism as Favorable with 1 substitute
On March 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Tourism
+ − Amendments (8)
+ − Votes (11)
April 7, 2021: Roll 817
- Yeas: 24
- Nays: 5
- Present/NV: 5
April 7, 2021: Roll 818
- Yeas: 31
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 2
April 7, 2021: Roll 819
- Yeas: 26
- Nays: 3
- Present/NV: 5
April 7, 2021: Roll 820
- Yeas: 19
- Nays: 12
- Present/NV: 3
April 7, 2021: Roll 821
- Yeas: 30
- Present/NV: 4
April 7, 2021: Roll 822
- Yeas: 28
- Present/NV: 6
April 7, 2021: Roll 823
- Yeas: 28
- Present/NV: 6
April 7, 2021: Roll 824
- Yeas: 32
- Present/NV: 2
April 7, 2021: Roll 825
- Yeas: 32
- Present/NV: 2
April 7, 2021: Roll 826
- Yeas: 32
- Present/NV: 2
April 7, 2021: Roll 827
- Yeas: 30
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 2
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor