+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (16)
On May 28, 2015 in the Senate:
- Assigned Act No. 2015-317.
- Enrolled
On May 28, 2015 in the House:
- Signature Requested
- Concurred in Second House Amendment
On May 28, 2015 in the Senate:
- Marsh motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 1288
- Concurrence Requested
On May 28, 2015 in the House:
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1153
- Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 1152
- Boards, Agencies and Commissions Amendment Offered
- Third Reading Passed
On April 30, 2015 in the House:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment
On April 16, 2015 in the House:
- Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Boards, Agencies and Commissions
On April 14, 2015 in the Senate:
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 461
- Third Reading Passed
On April 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On March 31, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Fiscal Responsibility and Economic Development
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (4)
May 28, 2015: Roll 1152
- Yeas: 100
- Present/NV: 5
May 28, 2015: Roll 1153
- Yeas: 99
- Present/NV: 6
May 28, 2015: Roll 1288
- Yeas: 29
- Present/NV: 6
April 14, 2015: Roll 461
- Yeas: 34
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor