+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (26)
On September 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read Second Time in Second House
On May 4, 2021 in the House:
- Economic Development and Tourism first Substitute Offered
- Pending third reading on day 29 Favorable from Economic Development and Tourism with 1 substitute
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar with 1 substitute and
On April 15, 2021 in the House:
- Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Economic Development and Tourism
On April 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- Engrossed
On April 13, 2021 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Carried Over to Call of the Chair
- McClendon first Substitute Offered
- McClendon motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 945
- Albritton Amendment Offered
- Albritton motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 946
- Albritton Amendment Offered
- Albritton motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 947
- McClendon motion to Carry Over to the Call of the Chair adopted Voice Vote
- Third Reading Passed
- Singleton Amendment Offered
- Singleton motion to Adopt lost Roll Call 959
- Roberts Amendment Offered
- McClendon motion to Table adopted Voice Vote
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 960
On April 7, 2021 in the Senate:
- McClendon motion to Carry Over to the Call of the Chair adopted Voice Vote
- McClendon motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 829
- Tourism first Substitute Offered
- Third Reading Carried Over to Call of the Chair
On March 18, 2021 in the Senate:
- Reported from Tourism as Favorable with 1 substitute
On March 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Tourism
+ − Amendments (7)
+ − Votes (6)
April 13, 2021: Roll 945
- Yeas: 23
- Nays: 5
- Present/NV: 6
April 13, 2021: Roll 946
- Yeas: 23
- Nays: 5
- Present/NV: 6
April 13, 2021: Roll 947
- Yeas: 28
- Nays: 3
- Present/NV: 3
April 13, 2021: Roll 959
- Yeas: 11
- Nays: 18
- Present/NV: 5
April 13, 2021: Roll 960
- Yeas: 23
- Nays: 9
- Present/NV: 2
April 7, 2021: Roll 829
- Yeas: 27
- Nays: 3
- Present/NV: 4
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor