+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (20)
On May 19, 2017 in the House:
- Signature Requested
On May 19, 2017 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
On May 19, 2017 in the House:
- Concurred in Second House Amendment
On May 19, 2017 in the Senate:
- Sanford motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 1332
- Concurrence Requested
On May 19, 2017 in the House:
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1039
- Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 1038
- State Government Amendment Offered
- Third Reading Passed
On April 27, 2017 in the House:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment
On April 18, 2017 in the House:
- Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on State Government
On April 18, 2017 in the Senate:
- Engrossed
On April 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 613
- McClendon motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 612
- McClendon Amendment Offered
- Sanford motion to Table adopted Voice Vote
- Fiscal Responsibility and Economic Development Amendment Offered
- Third Reading Passed
On April 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment
On March 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Fiscal Responsibility and Economic Development
+ − Votes (9)
May 19, 2017: Roll 1038
- Yeas: 96
- Present/NV: 9
May 19, 2017: Roll 1039
- Yeas: 101
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 2
May 19, 2017: Roll 1332
- Yeas: 23
- Nays: 6
- Present/NV: 6
May 17, 2017: Roll 1217
- Yeas: 29
- Present/NV: 6
May 4, 2017: Roll 815
- Yeas: 78
- Nays: 13
- Present/NV: 14
May 4, 2017: Roll 813
- Yeas: 76
- Nays: 14
- Present/NV: 15
May 4, 2017: Roll 814
- Yeas: 93
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 11
April 13, 2017: Roll 613
- Yeas: 23
- Nays: 4
- Present/NV: 8
April 13, 2017: Roll 612
- Yeas: 23
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 10
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor