+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (13)
On September 16, 2019 in the Senate:
- Enacted (Act 2019-371)
On May 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- Assigned Act No. 2019-371.
- Enrolled
On May 28, 2019 in the House:
- Signature Requested
On May 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed Second House
On May 23, 2019 in the House:
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 954
- Third Reading Passed
On May 14, 2019 in the House:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On May 7, 2019 in the House:
- Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Agriculture and Forestry
On May 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 624
- Third Reading Passed
On April 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On April 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Forestry
+ − Votes (2)
May 23, 2019: Roll 954
- Yeas: 97
- Present/NV: 7
May 7, 2019: Roll 624
- Yeas: 31
- Present/NV: 4
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor