+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (18)
On May 3, 2016 in the House:
- Signature Requested
On May 3, 2016 in the Senate:
- Passed Second House
- Enrolled
On April 28, 2016 in the House:
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 804
- Third Reading Passed
On March 23, 2016 in the House:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On March 17, 2016 in the House:
- Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Economic Development and Tourism
On March 17, 2016 in the Senate:
- Engrossed
On March 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed
- Third Reading Carried Over to Call of the Chair
- Marsh motion to Carry Over to the Call of the Chair adopted Voice Vote
- Marsh motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 403
- Marsh Amendment Offered
- Marsh motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 402
- Marsh Amendment Offered
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 404
On March 10, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On March 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Fiscal Responsibility and Economic Development
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (4)
April 28, 2016: Roll 804
- Yeas: 91
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 12
March 15, 2016: Roll 402
- Yeas: 29
- Present/NV: 6
March 15, 2016: Roll 403
- Yeas: 29
- Present/NV: 6
March 15, 2016: Roll 404
- Yeas: 29
- Present/NV: 6
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor