+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (13)
On May 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Delivered to Governor at 11:59 p.m. on May 20, 2013
- Assigned Act No. 2013-313.
- Enrolled
On May 20, 2013 in the House:
- Signature Requested
On May 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Passed Second House
On May 20, 2013 in the House:
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1279
- Third Reading Passed
On May 9, 2013 in the House:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On May 2, 2013 in the House:
- Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Local Legislation
On May 2, 2013 in the Senate:
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 728
- Third Reading Passed
On April 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On March 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation No. 1
+ − Vote
May 20, 2013: Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1279
- Yeas: 55
- Nays: 11
- Absent: 30
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor